Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ford Motor Credit Company LLC vs. Terra L Lugo
On August 10, 2010 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 10, 2010
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed. |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution submitted by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC rejected on 04/09/2018 . |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed. |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Santa Clara) Issued |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed. |
|
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (SANTA CLARA) Issued |
|
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed. |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed. |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (County of Placer) Issued |
|
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Court - Default filed. |
|
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court . | |
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court . | |
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (in Lieu of Testimony CCP 585d, CCP 1033) filed. |
|
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed. |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Urban, Anthony on Complaint . | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Lugo, Terra L on Complaint . | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default filed. |
|
October 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
August 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service filed. |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/13/2010 . | |
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 45 .
Judge: Judy Holzer Hersher |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|