Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Chase Bank USA NA vs. Susan L Mraule
On August 04, 2010 other collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 04, 2010
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
9 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/19/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by Chase Bank USA NA rejected on 05/03/2011 . |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Court - Default filed. |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court . | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court . | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/19/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Brief Summary of Case) filed. |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed. |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed. |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration in support of entry of default judgment) filed. |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration re Waiver of Attorneys Fees) filed. |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration re Lost Original Contract and Waiver of Excess Interest) filed. |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed. |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Mraule, Susan L on Complaint . | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration re Interest Computation) filed. |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/06/2010 . | |
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 35 .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|