Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Simon Amanuel vs. Macys Inc
On August 04, 2010 a pi/pd/wd - other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Laurie M. Earl presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 04, 2010
Last Refreshed
May 16, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 6 months and 18 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed. |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal . | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted . | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal . | |
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed. |
|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment For Minor or Person With a Disability has been Granted . | |
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed. |
|
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment For Minor or Person With a Disability filed. |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (unavailability of counsel) filed. |
|
May 05, 2011 | hearing |
Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion Heard |
|
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 05/05/2011 09:00:00 AM . |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 05/05/2011 09:00:00 AM published . |
|
May 02, 2011 | Tentative Ruling | Good cause appearing, and no opposition having been received, plaintiffs motion for a trial preference pursuant to CCP 36(b) is GRANTED. In accordance with CCP 36(f) this matter shall be given a tria...
Judge: Steve White |
|
April 28, 2011 | hearing |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard Judge: Gerrit W. Wood |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Referred to Master Calendar Department for Parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days. | |
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/28/2011 08:30:00 AM . |
|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Notes generated . | |
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/28/2011 08:30:00 AM published . |
|
April 19, 2011 | Tentative Ruling | No appearance is required under the following conditions: This matter is referred to the Trial Setting Process effective 10/13/2011 to allow discovery to be completed, unless Notice of Settlement, pur...
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Mediation Statement filed. |
|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal filed. |
|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Greeson, Chad Davis added as a effective 04/05/2011 . | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed. |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Of Alan M Laskin In Support Of Motion) filed. |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion - Other (For Preference In Civil Action) filed. |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion scheduled for 05/05/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/28/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood |
|
February 17, 2011 | hearing |
Motion - Other - Case Management Program Heard Judge: Gerrit W. Wood |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Case Management Program heard on 02/17/2011 08:30:00 AM . |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Case Management Program set on 02/17/2011 08:30:00 AM published . |
|
February 16, 2011 | Tentative Ruling | TENTATIVE RULING: Defendants and Cross-Complainants Motion to Reclassify the Action is DENIED. The court is satisfied that plaintiffs allegation of damages do not fall short of the jurisdictional li...
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood) |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Reply (re: Motion/Reclassify Action) filed. |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Lenkov, Jeffrey M. added as a effective 02/10/2011 . | |
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Appearance/Hearing - Ex Parte Calendar scheduled for 02/17/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Opposition (to Motion to Reclassify Action) filed. |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Jared B Gaynor) filed. |
|
January 26, 2011 | hearing |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: David I. Brown |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/26/2011 02:00:00 PM . |
|
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion to Reclassify filed. |
|
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (taking mtn to reclassify action as one of ltd jurisdiction off-calendar) filed. |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. |
|
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 01/26/2011 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion to Reclassify filed. |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
November 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons submitted by Macys Inc rejected on 11/18/2010 . |
|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. |
|
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer filed. |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer filed. |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint filed. |
|
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons issued . | |
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Kahssay, Hewot appointed as Guardian Ad Litem CR . | |
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 45 .
Judge: Judy Holzer Hersher |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. |