Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank Issuer of the Discover Card vs. Geraldine Armentrout
On November 20, 2008 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 20, 2008
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
7 years, 7 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of filed. |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed. |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney submitted by Discover Bank Issuer of the Discover Card rejected on 05/31/2011 . |
|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Muren, Tara added as a effective 05/24/2010 . | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed. |
|
March 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued |
|
March 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract issued . | |
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. |
|
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. |
|
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerks Judgment Filed |
|
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Waiver of Excess Attorneys Fees) filed. |
|
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Armentrout, Geraldine on Complaint . | |
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/20/2008 . | |
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 45 . |