Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Chase Bank USA NA vs. Eileen F Barr
On November 04, 2008 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 04, 2008
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Duration
2 months and 29 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. |
|
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service filed. |
|
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/17/2008 . | |
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 39 . | |
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|