Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Capital One Bank (USA) NA vs. Michelle L Abston
On April 25, 2008 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Roland L. Candee presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 25, 2008
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 3 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Abston, Michelle L on Complaint. | |
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 04/30/2008 . | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 43 . | |
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|