Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Capital One Bank (USA) NA vs. Robert L Weisz
On April 02, 2008 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Capital One Bank, represented by Lourdes R Slinsky, against Weisz, Robert L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 02, 2008
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
2 months and 25 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Dec re: Interest) filed. |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Dec re: CCP 1033(b)(2)) filed. |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint - (B&P 6322) disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Weisz, Robert L on Complaint - (B&P 6322) . | |
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Paper Exhibits filed. |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint - (B&P 6322) filed. |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Statement of Venue filed. |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 04/02/2008 . | |
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 43 . |