Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Chocorua Village Condominium Association v Eric Fleming, Trustee of the Eric Fleming Revocable Trust, et al
A Declaratory Judgment case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Merrimack County, NH.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 23, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 04, 2024
Filing Location
Merrimack County, NH
Category
Declaratory Judgment
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Granted
Judge: St. Hilaire, Daniel I |
|
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Granted
Judge: St. Hilaire, Daniel I |
|
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer to Counterclaim | |
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike | |
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Default | |
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer to Counterclaim | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Email-Address Notification or Change | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Default | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Counterclaim | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Other | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Non-Lawyer Affidavit Corporation | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Email-Address Notification or Change | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Counterclaim | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Counterclaim | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Email-Address Notification or Change | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Service | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Other | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint - Civil |