Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Robert Simpson, Plaintiff(s) vs. Maria Rojas-Lopez, Defendant(s)
A Negligence - Auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV. Judge Johnson, Susan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 26, 2012
Last Refreshed
November 25, 2020
Filing Location
Clark County, NV
Category
Negligence - Auto
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal Notice of Entry of Order |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service of Custodian of Records for Krisitan Aaron Johnson, Esq. | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer Defendant Maria Gabriela Rojas-Lopez Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Crossclaim Against Co-Defendant Derrick Flimmie Rooks |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Order Granting Defendant Maria Rojas-Lopez' Motion to Amend Pleadings |
|
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated - per Judge Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Amend Pleadings filed September 27, 2012 Having examined Defendant's Motion to Amend Pleadings filed September 27, 2012, noted Plaintiff was served with the motion via regular mail on September 27, 2012, no Opposition was filed, and good cause therefore, COURT ORDERS Defendant's Motion to Amend Pleadings filed September 27, 2012 is hereby GRANTED pursuant to EDCR 2.20(e). The matter scheduled to be heard on November 1, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED pursuant to EDCR 2.23. Counsel is to provide this Court a proposed Order within ten (10) days of this Minute Order, or no later than November 5, 2012 pursuant to EDCR 7.21. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was placed in the attorney folder(s) of: Bruce N. Willoughby, Esq. ( David L. Riddle & Associates). Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Non Opposition Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Amend Pleadings |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Vacated - per Law Clerk Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Answer Defendant's Motion to Amend Pleadings |
|
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Complaint Defendant's Motion to Amend Pleadings |
|
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Three Day Notice of Intent to Default Three Day Notice of Intent to Take Default - Derrick Flimmie Rooks |
|
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Advisement of Compliance-Defendant Derrick Flimmie Rooks | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Association of Counsel | |
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attempted Service - Derrick Rooks | |
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Due Diligence - Derrick Rooks | |
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure | |
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Demand For Jury Trial | |
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Defendants, Maria Gabriela Rojas-Lopez's Answer To Plaintiffs' Complaint |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure - Simpson | |
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Opened | |
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint |