Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TJ Yzaguirrevs.Uber Technologies, Inc. et al.
On April 23, 2024 a personal injury/death case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Yellowstone County. Judge Pardy, Thomas presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 23, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 18, 2024
Filing Location
Yellowstone County, MT
Filing Court House
District
Judge
Category
Personal Injury/Death
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued on Rasier-MT, LLC 05/01/2024
Judge: Pardy, Thomas |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued on Rasier-MT, LLC 05/01/2024
Judge: Pardy, Thomas |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued on Rasier-MT, LLC 05/01/2024
Judge: Pardy, Thomas |