Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FIRST INTERSTATE BANK vs. C T Corporation System et al.
On March 28, 2024 a foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Yellowstone County. Judge Harris, Donald presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 28, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 09, 2024
Filing Location
Yellowstone County, MT
Filing Court House
District
Judge
Category
Foreclosure
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Proposed
Judge: Harris, Donald |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Proposed
Judge: Harris, Donald |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Proposed
Judge: Harris, Donald |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Proposed
Judge: Harris, Donald |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Proposed
Judge: Harris, Donald |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Proposed
Judge: Harris, Donald |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Proposed
Judge: Harris, Donald |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Proposed
Judge: Harris, Donald |