Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MARISABEL CALDERON VS. USAA REAL ESTATE COMPANY
A Pi/Pd/Wd - Other case was filed in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Richard Y. Lee presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 26, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
PI/PD/WD - OTHER
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: LEE |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12879582 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12707341. |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 31007952 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2021 10:44:43 AM. | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 04/26/2021. | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED BY CALDERON, MARISABEL ON 04/26/2021 |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CALDERON, MARISABEL ON 04/26/2021 |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY CALDERON, MARISABEL ON 04/26/2021 |
|