Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GEORGE KYRIAKOS VS. PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA, INC.
A Breach Of Contract/Warranty case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge John C. Gastelum presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 26, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
BREACH OF CONTRACT/WARRANTY
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Duration
6 months and 25 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4695576 RECEIVED ON 03/20/2017 02:01:17 PM. | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KYRIAKOS, GEORGE ON 03/20/2017 |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2017 AT 08:45 AM IN DEPARTMENT C13. | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/24/2017 08:45:00 AM. |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2017 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: John C. Gastelum |
|
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4610266 RECEIVED ON 09/22/2016 10:12:57 PM. | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12034811 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11858816. |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA, INC. ON 09/22/2016 |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/24/2017 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: John C. Gastelum |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12021342 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11845367. |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2489111 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2016 03:48:52 PM. | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KYRIAKOS, GEORGE ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 08/26/2016. |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY KYRIAKOS, GEORGE ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KYRIAKOS, GEORGE ON 08/26/2016 |
|