Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROBERT LOUISELL VS. CITY OF SANTA ANA PARKING DIVISION
A Judicial Review - Other case was filed against City Of Santa Ana Parking Division, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Timothy J. Stafford presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 26, 2016
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
JUDICIAL REVIEW - OTHER
Practice Area
Appeals
Matter Type
General Appeals
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
27 days
Parties
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL (PARKING) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED. | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LOUISELL, ROBERT ON 09/22/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
PARKING APPEAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Timothy J. Stafford |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON PARKING CITATION AND REQUEST FOR FILE |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED BY LOUISELL, ROBERT ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL (PARKING) FILED BY LOUISELL, ROBERT ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LOUISELL, ROBERT J. FOR 95 - APPEAL OF PARKING VIOLATION: APPEAL OF FINAL DECISION ON PARKING CITATION VIOLATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12021175 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11845203. |
|