Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS. ANDREW G JANSON
A Rule 3.740 Collections case was filed by Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, against Andrew G Janson, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 26, 2016
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 24 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 1431279 RECEIVED ON 10/17/2017 09:48:10 AM. | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 10/17/2017 |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/08/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Corey Scott Cramin |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12020841 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11844869. |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 1339977 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2016 09:29:12 AM. |