Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HOANG REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, LLC VS. RICHARD BARTLETT
An Unlawful Detainer - Residential case was filed by Hoang Real Estate Investment, Llc, against Richard Bartlett, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Carmen R. Luege presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 11, 2012
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY HOANG REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, LLC ON 04/02/2013 |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (FAX TRANSMISSION TO OC SHERIFF'S DEPARTMEMT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/05/2013 |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/04/2013 01:30:00 PM. |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 02/04/2013 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Carmen R. Luege |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11306863 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11130755. |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application - OTHER FILED BY BARTLETT, RICHARD ON 01/31/2013 |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11296779 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11120671. |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 136427 RECEIVED ON 01/10/2013 12:06:25 PM. | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/15/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Carmen R. Luege |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY HOANG REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, LLC ON 01/10/2013 |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK. | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession FILED BY HOANG REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, LLC ON 01/10/2013 |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | WRIT RECEIVED ON 01/10/2013. |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY HOANG REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, LLC ON 01/10/2013 |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK | |
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 134138 RECEIVED ON 01/04/2013 04:16:51 PM. | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY HOANG REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, LLC ON 01/07/2013 |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY HOANG REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, LLC ON 01/07/2013 |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons FILED BY HOANG REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, LLC ON 01/07/2013 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY HOANG REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, LLC ON 12/11/2012 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HOANG REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, LLC ON 12/11/2012 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11279274 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11103166. |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED BY HOANG REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, LLC ON 12/11/2012 |
|