Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY VS. ALBERT MEYLING
A Breach Of Contract/Warranty case was filed by Lexington Insurance Company, against Albert Meyling, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 04, 2012
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
BREACH OF CONTRACT/WARRANTY
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 150175 RECEIVED ON 02/06/2013 03:11:03 PM. | |
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons FILED BY LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/06/2013 |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2184334 RECEIVED ON 01/16/2013 11:35:23 AM. | |
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. | |
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement FILED BY LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/16/2013 |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/16/2013 |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11275417 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11099309. |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2166859 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2012 11:06:17 AM. | |
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/04/2012 |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED BY LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/04/2012 |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/04/2012 |
|