Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS. TAFALE FAATAUI IULI
A Pi/Pd/Wd - Auto case was filed by Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automob, against Tafale Faataui Iuli, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Glenn Mondo presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 09, 2009
Last Refreshed
June 04, 2024
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
PI/PD/WD - AUTO
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 years, 9 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2012 | Docket Event | TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012. | |
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 08/26/2010 |
|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) SUBMITTED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE REJECTED ON 08/06/2010. |
|
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/29/2010 01:30:00 PM. |
|
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/31/2010 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W10 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Glenn Mondo |
|
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event | THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 08/31/2010 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT W10. | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 06/28/2010 |
|
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 06/28/2010 |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 06/08/2010 |
|
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/2010 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W10 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Glenn Mondo |
|
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE REJECTED ON 05/14/2010. |
|
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 03/01/2010 |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 01/21/2010 |
|
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 135 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 330.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10356229. |
|
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 12/09/2009 |
|
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 12/09/2009 |
|
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 12/09/2009 |
|