Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HONDA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS. CLARION W LABASAN
An Enforcement case was filed by Honda Federal Credit Union, against Jeani J Labasan, and Clarion W Labasan, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 07, 2009
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
ENFORCEMENT
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Judgment Enforcement
Status
Foreign,Sister-State Judgment
Case Duration
2 years, 9 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2012 | Docket Event | TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012. | |
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event | WRIT UPDATED ON 04/27/2010. | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY HONDA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ON 02/16/2012 |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - Abstract of Judgment IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10513660. |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED. | |
June 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment SUBMITTED BY HONDA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION REJECTED ON 06/16/2010. |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - Abstract of Judgment IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10448885. |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED. | |
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10448888. |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT ISSUED. | |
March 26, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT; JUDGMENT ENTRY) FILED BY HONDA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ON 03/26/2010 |
|
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE ON NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT) FILED BY HONDA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ON 02/01/2010 |
|
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT) FILED BY HONDA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ON 01/04/2010 |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 135 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 330.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10527861 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10351734. |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY HONDA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ON 12/07/2009 |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT ON 12/07/2009. | |
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED BY HONDA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ON 12/07/2009 |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FOR HONDA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION IN THE AMOUNT OF 14258.79 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST LABASAN, CLARION W ;LABASAN, JEANI J . |