Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IMPERIAL SPRINKLER SUPPLY, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS. P M L 4 ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
A Breach Of Contract/Warranty case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 07, 2009
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
BREACH OF CONTRACT/WARRANTY
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 years, 6 months and 23 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY IMPERIAL SPRINKLER SUPPLY, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/21/2010 |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 135 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 330.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10527171 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10351044. |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY IMPERIAL SPRINKLER SUPPLY, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/07/2009 |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED BY IMPERIAL SPRINKLER SUPPLY, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/07/2009 |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IMPERIAL SPRINKLER SUPPLY, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/07/2009 |
|