Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BBMB INCORPORATED V DANNY& ANGELA MICHEL (E-CASE)
On June 23, 2022 an ac small claims over $100 case was filed by Bbmb Incorporated, against Michel , Angela, and Michel , Danny, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, MO. Judge HYDE, TROY KEITH presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 23, 2022
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Washington County, MO
Filing Court House
MO-Washington
Judge
Category
AC Small Claims over $100
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit Filed | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Pet Filed Small Claims | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued-Associate | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Trial Scheduled | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Scheduled Scheduled For: 08/17/2022; 2:30 PM ; TROY KEITH HYDE; Washington |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Associate Document ID: 22-ADSM-1282, for MICHEL, DANNY. |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Associate Document ID: 22-SMSC-93, for MICHEL, ANGELA. |