Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Brian A. Lutes, Wright County Attorney vs. 2016 Kia Soul, MN license plate: KTA701, VIN: KNDJP3A5XG7310752
On April 25, 2024 a forfeiture case was filed by Wright County Attorney, represented by Duis, Aaron David - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Wright County, MN. Judge McPherson, Catherine presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 25, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 30, 2024
Filing Location
Wright County, MN
Filing Court House
District
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint involves the forfeiture of defendant property that was used or intended for use in the commission of Fleeing a Peace Officer in violation of Minn. Stat. § 609.487. The property, owned and possessed by Terry Lavar McWilliams in Wrig…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Certify Personal Service Index 5
Date: Apr 26, 2024Notice of Seizure and Intent to Forfeit Index 3
Date: Apr 25, 2024Summons Index 1
Date: Apr 25, 2024Complaint-Civil Index 2
Date: Apr 25, 2024Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index 4
Date: Apr 25, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index #5 | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Seizure and Intent to Forfeit Index #3 | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Index #1 | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil Index #2 | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4 |