Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ramsey County Child Support, Kimberly Marie Lane vs Felipe Bullock Dewberry
On May 23, 2022 a paternity case was filed by Lane, Kimberly Marie, and Ramsey County Child Support, against Dewberry, Felipe Bullock, in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN. Judge Anderson, Ronelle presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 23, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 23, 2022
Filing Location
Ramsey County, MN
Judge
Category
Paternity
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Paternity
Case Outcome Type
Paternity Determination - Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Judgment of Paternity
Date: Jul 29, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: Jul 29, 2022Order Establishing Paternity
Date: Jul 29, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: May 23, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Index # 16 | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment of Paternity | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Establishing Paternity | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment of Paternity Index # 15 | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 14 | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Establishing Paternity Index # 13 (Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle )
Judge: Anderson, Ronelle |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Support order (Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle)
Judge: Anderson, Ronelle |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Paternity Determination - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle)
Judge: Anderson, Ronelle |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 12 (Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle )
Judge: Anderson, Ronelle |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement | |
May 23, 2022 | hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 11 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Expedited Process | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 10 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 9 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Information Form 11.1 personal information Index # 8 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Department of Employment and Economic Development Index # 6 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Genetic Test Report Index # 7 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Identity Index # 5 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other Index # 4 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint-Family Index # 2 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Supporting Affidavit of Child Support Officer Index # 3 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index # 1 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Filed | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Genetic Test Report | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Supporting Affidavit of Child Support Officer | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint-Family | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Department of Employment and Economic Development | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Information Form 11.1 personal information | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Identity | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service |