Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In re the Marriage of Michelle Lynne Westlund and Jeffrey Franklin Westlund
On January 31, 2022 a dissolution without child case was filed in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN. Judge Harris, JaPaul presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 09, 2022
Filing Location
Ramsey County, MN
Judge
Category
Dissolution without Child
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Change of name granted
Status
Other
Parties
Other Parties
Case Documents
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: Aug 31, 2022Certificate of Dissolution
Date: Aug 30, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: Aug 18, 2022Judgment
Date: Aug 18, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: Aug 18, 2022Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: Aug 17, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 06, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: Jun 02, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: Mar 16, 2022ICMC Order - Opted Out of Early Neutral Evaluation
Date: Mar 11, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: Mar 11, 2022Notice of Case Assignment
Date: Feb 04, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy Request Index # 23
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy Request | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 22
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Dissolution Index # 21 (Judicial Officer: Harris, JaPaul J )
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Dissolution
Judge: Harris, JaPaul J |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy Request Index # 20
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy Request | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 18
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party Index # 19
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 17
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 15 (Judicial Officer: Elsmore, Victoria )
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Name Change Sent to Secretary of State
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 16
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Elsmore, Victoria) Party( Westlund, Michelle Lynne; Westlund, Jeffrey Franklin ) Non-Monetary - Entry Order of the Court
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Change of name granted (Judicial Officer: Elsmore, Victoria) Party( Westlund, Michelle Lynne )
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dissolution Granted - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Elsmore, Victoria)
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution Index # 14 (Judicial Officer: Elsmore, Victoria )
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 13
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 12
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
July 06, 2022 | hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 11
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
June 02, 2022 | hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Using Remote Technology
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 10
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
March 16, 2022 | hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 9
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
ICMC Order - Opted Out of Early Neutral Evaluation Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Elsmore, Victoria )
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
ICMC Order - Opted Out of Early Neutral Evaluation
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Using Remote Technology
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Index # 7
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Representation Index # 6
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Admission of Service Index # 5
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Representation Index # 3
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Filed
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Index # 1
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form 11.1 personal information Index # 4
Judge: Elsmore, Victoria |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Admission of Service | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Information Form 11.1 personal information |