Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHALET DENTAL CARE, P.A. vs RICKY SOK
On May 23, 2022 a conciliation case was filed in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 23, 2022
Last Refreshed
September 19, 2022
Filing Location
Ramsey County, MN
Category
Conciliation
Case Documents
Notice-Other
Date: Aug 18, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: Aug 10, 2022Statement of Claim
Date: May 23, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice-Other | |
August 10, 2022 | hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim |