Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Center For Diagnostic Imaging vs Carolyn Terry
On December 30, 2021 a conciliation case was filed by Center For Diagnostic Imaging, represented by Roberts, James Ivan - Lead Attorney, against Terry, Carolyn, in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN. Judge Closed presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 30, 2023
Filing Location
Ramsey County, MN
Judge
Hon. Closed
Category
Conciliation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index 8
Date: Feb 18, 2022Judgment Index 7
Date: Feb 18, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Hintz, Daniel Index 6
Date: Feb 11, 2022Power of Attorney Index 5
Date: Feb 03, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index 4
Date: Jan 06, 2022Certificate of Representation Index 3
Date: Dec 30, 2021Correspondence Index 2
Date: Dec 30, 2021Statement of Claim Index 1
Date: Dec 30, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #9 | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index # 9 | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #8 | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #7 | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 8 | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 7 | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Hintz, Daniel Index #6 | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology Filed By: Plaintiff Center For Diagnostic Imaging | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant Terry, Carolyn | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment Index # 6 (Judicial Officer: Hintz,Daniel , )
Judge: Hintz,Daniel , |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Power of Attorney Index #5 | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Power of Attorney Index # 5 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 4 | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation Index #3 | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #2 | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim Index #1 | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 2 | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim Index # 1 | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation Index # 3 |