Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
27-CV-HC-23-868
On January 31, 2023 an eviction (ud) case was filed in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2023
Last Refreshed
March 08, 2023
Filing Location
Hennepin County, MN
Category
Eviction (UD)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Parties
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 9 (Judicial Officer: Reed, Franklin )
Judge: Reed, Franklin |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held In-Person | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Remote or In-Person Appearance Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Reed, Franklin )
Judge: Reed, Franklin |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction, Non-Payment of Rent - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Reed, Franklin)
Judge: Reed, Franklin |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Index # 7 | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Not Found Index # 5 | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 6 | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Plaintiff Index # 4 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index # 3 | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil Index # 1 | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice-Other Index # 2 |