Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs Kenyatta Mukes
On April 22, 2024 a default judgment case was filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, represented by Hicks, William C - Lead Attorney, against Mukes, Kenyatta, in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN. Judge Peralta, Nelson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 22, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 24, 2024
Filing Location
Hennepin County, MN
Filing Court House
District
Judge
Category
Default Judgment
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint involves Credit Acceptance Corporation suing Kenyatta Mukes for defaulting on a contract secured by a motor vehicle. The outstanding principal balance due is $8,635.91, and Defendant(s) also owe Plaintiff interest in the amount of …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Case Assignment Index 4
Date: Apr 23, 2024Summons and Complaint Index 1
Date: Apr 22, 2024Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index 3
Date: Apr 22, 2024Affidavit of Service Index 2
Date: Apr 22, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment Index #4 | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint Index #1 | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index #3 | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #2 | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Filed |