Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Value Homes LLC vs Agape Assisted Living and Housing Services Inc, Lachandra Gums, John Doe, Mary Roe
On January 24, 2023 a civil other/misc. case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN. Judge Reed, Franklin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2023
Last Refreshed
October 28, 2023
Filing Location
Hennepin County, MN
Judge
Hon. Reed, Franklin
Category
Civil Other/Misc.
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index 9
Date: Mar 09, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Reed, Franklin Index 8
Date: Mar 03, 2023Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Reed, Franklin Index 6
Date: Mar 02, 2023Affidavit of Service Index 4
Date: Feb 22, 2023Eviction Summons Index 3
Date: Feb 16, 2023Notice of Case Assignment Index 2
Date: Jan 25, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #9 | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Reed, Franklin Index #8 | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Writ of Recovery Filed By: Attorney SWANSON, SCOTT WILLIAM; Plaintiff Value Homes LLC Index #7 | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Reed, Franklin Index #6 | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Remote or In-Person Appearance Judicial Officer: Reed, Franklin Index #5 | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant Agape Assisted Living and Housing Services Inc; Defendant Gums, Lachandra | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held In-Person
Judge: Reed, Franklin |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 6 (Judicial Officer: Reed, Franklin )
Judge: Reed, Franklin |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fail to Appear at a hearing
Judge: Reed, Franklin |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Remote or In-Person Appearance Index # 5 (Judicial Officer: Reed, Franklin )
Judge: Reed, Franklin |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction, Non-Payment of Rent - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Reed, Franklin)
Judge: Reed, Franklin |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #4 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 4
Judge: Reed, Franklin |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index #3 | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Summons Index # 3
Judge: Reed, Franklin |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment Index #2 | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Index # 2
Judge: Reed, Franklin |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil Filed By: Attorney ENGEL, MATTHEW ALLEN; Plaintiff Value Homes LLC Index #1 | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint-Civil Index # 1
Judge: Reed, Franklin |