Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Aguillar, E. vs. Ruvalcaba, J.
A Dv Prevention W/ Minor Children case was filed by Aguillar, Evangelina, against Ruvalcaba, Jesus G., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. Judge Maria Mihm presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 16, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Napa County, CA
Category
DV Prevention w/ Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
29 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Oct 24 2013 Type: 943410 - Dismissal: Other Manner : 942110 - After Hearing |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931210-OSC Hearing;C Certified Aguillar, E. vs. Ruvalcaba, J. Motion OSC Details: 936810 - Return from FCS ; Judge: J21197 Langhorne Monique Additional Info : Minor's Counsel Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931210-OSC Hearing;C Certified Aguillar, E. vs. Ruvalcaba, J. Motion OSC Details: 911220 - Domestic Violence ; Judge: J21197 Langhorne Monique Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Agreement 933210-Agreement Filed/Issued By: AGREEMENT [933210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 912920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [912920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment 937910-Mediation Appointment; Aguillar, E. vs. Ruvalcaba, J. ; Mediator: FL0005 Mihm Maria Judge: Mihm, Maria |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed 929210-Order: Proposed Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per Status : 241110 - Vacated/Set Aside; Date: 2013-10-24 00:00:00ORDER: PROPOSED [929210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: Mediation Appointment 951110-Mediation Appointment Letter Filed/Issued By: |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration 913310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DECLARATION [913310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Exparte Application 912430-Hearing: Exparte; Aguillar, E. vs. Ruvalcaba, J. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 912920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per NOTICE OF HEARING [912920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order: Temporary Restraining Order 928120-Order: Temporary Rest. Order Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per ORDER: TEMPORARY REST. ORDER [928120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLETS Form 929410-CLETS Form* Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per CLETS FORM* [929410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request 929110-Request Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per REQUEST [929110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
FCS Orientation Complete 937740 - Orientation Completion - Mother |
|
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
FCS Orientation Complete 937741 - Orientation Completion - Father |