Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Terra Nova Insurance Co., et al. vs. F.W. Forbes & Co.
An Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case was filed by Terra Nova Insurance Co., represented by Rose, David Vinson, against F.W. Forbes & Co., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. Judge Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 25, 2005
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Napa County, CA
Category
Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Oct 4 2005 Type: 243410 - Dismissal: Other Court Ordered Manner : 241110 - Before Trial |
|
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Terra Nova Insurance Co., et al. vs. F.W. Forbes & Co. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response 212410-Answer Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per ANSWER [212410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) 212320-Proof of Service: Summons (DLR) Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE: Summons (DLR) [212320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Other DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 ; ; ; ; |
|
May 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222110-Summons: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Documents Prior to 5-17-05 DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 |