Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts vs. 2003 Honda Odyssey VIN 5FNRL18953B129798
On July 30, 2020 a forfeiture, g.l. c. 94c, § 47 case was filed by Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, represented by Hautanen, Esq., Sandra L, against 2003 Honda Odyssey Vin 5Fnrl18953B129798, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 30, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 13, 2023
Filing Location
Worcester County, MA
Category
Administrative Civil Actions
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Forfeiture
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: Jul 30, 2020Complaint electronically filed.-CJ
Date: Jul 30, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Agreement for Judgment (E-FILED) Applies To: Commonwealth Of Massachusetts (Plaintiff) | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 07/31/2020 | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed.-CJ |