Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Mass v $7,000.00
On March 09, 2009 a forfeiture, g.l. c. 94c, § 47 case was filed by Comm Of Mass, against $7,000.00, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 09, 2009
Last Refreshed
April 26, 2021
Filing Location
Worcester County, MA
Category
Administrative Civil Actions
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Forfeiture
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMEBT; It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED; 1. That the defendant $7,000.00 in US Currency, seized on October 28, 2008 is hereby forfeited as to interested party Rishaud R. Gomez; 2. That of the Defendant $7,000.00 in US Currency, $3,500.00 in US Currency be forfeited to the Commonwealth of Massachusetts through the District Attorney's Office for the Middle District to be used for education, investigation and prosecution of cases and the use thereof as provided for under G.L. Chapter 94C, Section 47; 3. The balance in the amount of $3,500.00 in US Currency be forfeited to the Massachusetts State Police to be used for the same purpose as stated above and 4. Said Judgment forfeits any and all interests that Rishaud R. Gomes may have in the defendant (see Judgment) ( Peter W. Agnes, Jr., Justice), Entered and Copies mailed 4/24/2009 | |
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#7) ALLOWED (Peter W. Agnes, Jr., Justice) Notices mailed 4/24/2009 | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Comm of Mass's MOTION for judgment of default against Rishaud R Gomes | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant Rishaud R Gomes. Copies mailed 4/9/2009 | |
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Rishaud R Gomes is not in military service | |
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Rishaud R Gomes by Comm of Mass & Affidavit in support | |
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Rishaud R Gomes, service made on 3/12/2009 (certified mail) | |
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Tracking deadlines amended: Commonwelth's Motion to amend track designation from "Fast" to "Average" ALLOWED. Changed in header and tracking order mailed 3-17-09 | |
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#2) ALLOWED (James R. Lemire, Justice) Notices mailed 3/17/2009 | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Track changed to F, Origin 1, Type E95. | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Comm of Mass's MOTION to amend track designation from "fast" to 'average". MEMO in support of commonwealth motion to amend tarck designation from"fast" to "average". | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type E95, Track F. | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Comm of Mass pursuant to M G L c 94C, Sec. 47 |