Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Commonwealth of Massachusetts vs. XEX LTD
On June 25, 2024 an other administrative action case was filed by Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, represented by Hooley, Esq., Diana Kate, against Xex Ltd, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA. Judge Rosemary Connolly presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 25, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 26, 2024
Filing Location
Suffolk County, MA
Category
Administrative Civil Actions
Practice Area
Administrative
Matter Type
General Adminstrative
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is brought by the Commonwealth of Massachusetts against XEX LTD. The Commonwealth alleges that XEX is operating a fraudulent cryptocurrency platform, deceiving investors with false promises of profits. XEX's representatives engage …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER: See p5 for full Order. (dated 6/25/24) Notice in hand
Date: Jun 25, 2024Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusettss Motion for Alternative Service
Date: Jun 25, 2024Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: Jun 25, 2024Original civil complaint filed.
Date: Jun 25, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Alternative Service (#4.0): ALLOWED (dated 6/25/24) Notice in hand | |
June 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Appoint Special Process Server (#3.0): ALLOWED (dated 6/25/24) Notice in hand | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Memorandum in support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit in support of Motion for Alternative Service Applies To: Hooley, Esq., Diana Kate (Attorney) on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Plaintiff) | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Diana Kate Hooley, Esq. added for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit in support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Applies To: Hooley, Esq., Diana Kate (Attorney) on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Plaintiff) | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Memorandum in support of Motion for Alternative Service | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 06/25/2024 | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons and order of notice issued on a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction , returnable on 06/28/2024 11:00 AM Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER: See p#5 for full Order. (dated 6/25/24) Notice in hand | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Motion to Appoint Special Process Server
Judge: Connolly, Rosemary |
|
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Motion for Alternative Service | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
June 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. |