Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the matter of: Boudreau, Albert T.
On July 29, 2022 an informal probate of will with appointment of personal representative case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA. Judge Monks, Hon. Maureen H presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 29, 2022
Last Refreshed
August 13, 2022
Filing Location
Middlesex County, MA
Filing Court House
Middlesex County Probate and Family Court
Category
Estates and Administration
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Devisees
Date: Jul 29, 2022Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate
Date: Jul 29, 2022Will of Albert T. Boudreau dated: 2/22/2022, 8 pages
Date: Jul 29, 2022Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: Jul 29, 2022Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed John F. Boudreau
Date: Jul 29, 2022Petition for Informal Probate
Date: Jul 29, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 08/01/2022 15:27:40 | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 08/01/2022 08:16:15 | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Informal Probate of Will and/or Appointment of Personal Representative dated: 7/29/2022 Judge: Verrocchi, Rhonda | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 07/29/2022, by Rhonda Verrocchi Judge: Verrocchi, Rhonda | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Stephen W. Boudreau Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Devisees | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | John F. Boudreau Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Will of Albert T. Boudreau dated: 2/22/2022, 8 pages | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed John F. Boudreau | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Informal Probate | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Death |