Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nascimento, Jr., Frederico Couto vs. Barbosa, Fabiana Moreira
On July 29, 2022 a divorce 1b case was filed by Nascimento, Jr., Frederico Couto, represented by Dasilva, Esq., Idelta, against Barbosa, Fabiana Moreira, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA. Judge Klug-Cafazzo, Hon. Terri L. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 29, 2022
Last Refreshed
August 13, 2022
Filing Location
Middlesex County, MA
Filing Court House
Middlesex County Probate and Family Court
Judge
Hon. Klug-Cafazzo, Hon. Terri L.
Category
Domestic Relations
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Plaintiffs Motion For Further Temporary Orders
Date: Aug 09, 2022Emergency Ex Parte Motion For Short Order of Notice
Date: Aug 09, 2022Motion For Documents and Child Support
Date: Aug 05, 2022Motion For Short Order of Notice
Date: Aug 05, 2022Affidavit Of Emergency
Date: Aug 05, 2022Trial/Scheduling Order, Dated 8/3/2022
Date: Aug 05, 2022Stipulation of the Parties
Date: Aug 03, 2022Summons Filed, Date of Service 07/30/2022
Date: Aug 01, 2022Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: Jul 29, 2022Complaint for Divorce - Irretrievable Breakdown 1B
Date: Jul 29, 2022Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody
Date: Jul 29, 2022Plaintiffs Motion For Temporary Orders
Date: Jul 29, 2022Affidavit Of Applies To: Nascimento, Jr., Frederico Couto (Plaintiff)
Date: Jul 29, 2022Emergency Ex-Parte Motion For Short Order of Notice
Date: Jul 29, 2022Request For Interpreter Portuguese
Date: Jul 29, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Ex Parte Hearing (Emergency) scheduled on: 08/10/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Terri L. Klug-Cafazzo, Presiding
Judge: Klug-Cafazzo, Terri L. |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion For Further Temporary Orders | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Emergency Ex Parte Motion For Short Order of Notice | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion To Continue Defendant's Request For Documents and Child Support | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion For Documents and Child Support | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion For Short Order of Notice | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Emergency | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Trial/Scheduling Order, Dated 8/3/2022 | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation of the Parties | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Motion scheduled on: 08/03/2022 09:00 AM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Terri L. Klug-Cafazzo, Presiding
Judge: Klug-Cafazzo, Terri L. |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Notice and Order Sent Judge: Klug-Cafazzo, Hon. Terri L. Event: Pretrial Conference Domestic and Equity Date: 02/02/2023 Time: 09:00 AM
Judge: Klug-Cafazzo, Terri L. |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Filed, Date of Service 07/30/2022 | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion For Short Order of Notice ALLOWED on 07/29/2022 File Reference # 8 Judge: Anthony, Hon. Christine D. | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for Divorce - Irretrievable Breakdown 1B | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed by Applies To: Dasilva, Esq., Idelta (Attorney) on behalf of Nascimento, Jr., Frederico Couto (Plaintiff) | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion For Temporary Orders | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Applies To: Nascimento, Jr., Frederico Couto (Plaintiff) | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Emergency Ex-Parte Motion For Short Order of Notice | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Request For Interpreter Portuguese | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons issued on complaint for Divorce filed 7/29/22. | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Mass. Statistical R408 Form | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Marriage |