Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Da Rocha, Jonas A vs. Tully, Alyssa K.
On July 29, 2022 a divorce 1b case was filed by Da Rocha, Jonas A, represented by Carty, Esq., Andrea T, against Tully, Alyssa K., in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA. Judge Klug-Cafazzo, Hon. Terri L. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 29, 2022
Last Refreshed
August 12, 2022
Filing Location
Middlesex County, MA
Filing Court House
Middlesex County Probate and Family Court
Judge
Hon. Klug-Cafazzo, Hon. Terri L.
Category
Domestic Relations
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Complaint for Divorce - Irretrievable Breakdown 1B
Date: Jul 29, 2022Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody
Date: Jul 29, 2022Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: Jul 29, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons issued on complaint for Divorce Filed 07/29/2022. | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for Divorce - Irretrievable Breakdown 1B | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Mass. Statistical R408 Form | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Marriage |