Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Duarte Mendoca, Maria Paula vs. Martins Mendoca, Joao
On July 29, 2022 special immigrant juvenile status case was filed by Duarte Mendoca, Maria Paula, represented by Gardini, Esq., Ludovino P, against Martins Mendoca, Joao, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA. Judge Anthony, Hon. Christine D. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 29, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 13, 2023
Filing Location
Middlesex County, MA
Filing Court House
Middlesex County Probate and Family Court
Judge
Hon. Anthony, Hon. Christine D.
Category
Special Immigration Juvenile Status
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Findings
Date: Aug 12, 2022Judgment of Dependency
Date: Aug 12, 2022Complaint for Dependency Pursuant to G.L. c.119, s.39M
Date: Jul 29, 2022Motion
Date: Jul 29, 2022Assent
Date: Jul 29, 2022Motion
Date: Jul 29, 2022Motion
Date: Jul 29, 2022Motion
Date: Jul 29, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Findings | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dependency | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for Dependency Pursuant to G.L. c.119, s.39M | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Assent | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Birth |