Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Purington, Cynthia vs. Torrigton One Llc
On July 29, 2022 an other negligence - personal injury / property damage case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA. Judge Christopher K presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 29, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 27, 2023
Filing Location
Middlesex County, MA
Judge
Hon. Christopher K
Category
Torts
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT 1- NEGLIGENCE
COUNT II – VIOLATION OF STATE BUILDING CODE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 08/01/2022
Date: Aug 01, 2022Complaint electronically filed.
Date: Jul 29, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: Jul 29, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (#11.0): DENIED Dated 11/9/23 After review, the Motion is DENIED without prejudice to the Plaintiff to re-file a motion that complies with Superior Court Rule 9A(b)(ii), which requires that such a motion (to amend by adding parties) be served on the proposed new parties. | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Zodikoff, Esq., Alexander (Attorney) on behalf of Purington, Cynthia (Plaintiff) | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Cynthia Purington's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (with Exhibit A) | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend discovery and tracking (#10.0): ALLOWED motion to extend tracking order is allowed for 90 days, not 150 days; the task identified do not require a five month extension as they are quite limited. Dated on p.2, as edited are adopted. No further extensions should be expected. Judge: Barry-Smith, Hon. Christopher K | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Vital, Esq., Ryan J (Attorney) on behalf of Torrigton One Llc (Defendant) | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Cynthia Purington, Torrigton One Llc's Joint Motion to Extend Discovery and Tracking Order Deadlines | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application/motion (#8.0) to allow to inspect hospital records regarding Cynthia Purington, from . Encompass Rehab Hospital | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application/motion (#6.0) to allow to inspect hospital records regarding Cynthia Purington, from Lahey Hospital & Medical Center . | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Torrigton One Llc's Application for An Order for a Copy of Hospital Records from Encompass Rehab Hospital, with affidavit of notice in compliance with SC rule 13. | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Application of Defendant Torrigton One Llc for hospital records from Lahey Hospital & Medical Center, with affidavit of notice in compliance with SC rule 13. Applies To: Purington, Cynthia (Plaintiff) | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Application of Defendant Torrigton One Llc for hospital records from Massachusetts General Hospital, with affidavit of notice in compliance with SC rule 13. Applies To: Purington, Cynthia (Plaintiff) | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application/motion (#4.0) to allow Ryan J Vital, Esq.to inspect hospital records regarding Cynthia Purington, from Massachusetts General Hospital . | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Torrigton One Llc: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Ryan J Vital, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Torrigton One Llc | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Peter E Heppner, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Torrigton One Llc | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 08/01/2022 | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. |