Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Greenwood industries,Inc. vs. The Hanover Insurance Company
On August 31, 2016 a construction surety bond, g.l. c. 149, §§ 29, 29a case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA. Judge John T. Lu presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2016
Last Refreshed
July 13, 2023
Filing Location
Middlesex County, MA
Category
Administrative Civil Actions
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Construction
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I- CONTRACT G.L. ¢. 149 § 29 — Hanover Insurance Company
COUNT Il—- QUANTUM MERUIT
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Massachusetts Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties, by and through their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate and agree to the dismissal of this action with prejudice, with each party to bear it's own costs and attorneys' fees and with all rights of appeal waived. Applies To: Greenwood industries,Inc. (Plaintiff); The Hanover Insurance Company (Defendant) | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Jonathan Christopher Burwood, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant The Hanover Insurance Company | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) by 120 days (#7.0): After review and by agreement of the parties ALLOWED Dated 8/21/18 Judge: Lu, Hon. John T
Judge: John TLu |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Greenwood industries,Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company's Joint Motion to extend tracking order deadlines (120 days) | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Christopher W Morog, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Greenwood industries,Inc. | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Chad Vacarella, Esq. added for Defendant The Hanover Insurance Company | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date CharCretia V Di Bartolo, Esq. added for Defendant The Hanover Insurance Company | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant The Hanover Insurance Company: Answer to original complaint; | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Edward J Quinlan, Esq. added for Defendant The Hanover Insurance Company | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant The Hanover Insurance Company: Service through person in charge / agent; 09/09/2016 CT Corp 155 Federal St Suite 700 Boston, Ma | |
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant The Hanover Insurance Company: Service made in hand; to Space Case reception MA Div of Ins. 9/9/16 | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Greenwood industries,Inc.'s MOTION for appointment of Special Process Server. of Hank Dewsnap of Dewsnap & Associates,LLC. ALLOWED | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 08/31/2016 NEW TRACKING ISSUED ON 8/21/18 | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Cori Phillips Palmer, Esq. added for Plaintiff Greenwood industries,Inc. |