Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dealy, Brian F., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against Blank, M.D., Jody S., Dubin, M.D., Joseph, Gutierrez,M.D., Jose, Lahey Clinic Foundation,Inc., Lahey Clinic Hospital,Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Gould, Esq., David Miles, Mccloskey, Esq., Rachel S, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with S. Jane Haggerty presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Brian F. Dealy Personal Representative for the Estate of Cynthia A. Dealy's original complaint waiving all rights of appeal. | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Malpractice Tribunal scheduled for 01/26/2017 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: By Court prior to date | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER for medical malpractice tribunal for Internal Medicine, with Hon. S. Jane Haggerty presiding, Kyan J. Berger, M.D. 102 Old Essex Road Manchester, MA 01944 and Jeffrey Travaline, Esq. Applies To: Brian F. Dealy Personal Representative for the Estate of Cynthia A. Dealy (Plaintiff); Gould, Esq., David Miles (Attorney) on behalf of Dubin, M.D., Joseph, Gutierrez,M.D., Jose, Lahey Clinic Foundation,Inc., Lahey Clinic Hospital,Inc., Lahey Clinic Inc. (Defendant); McCloskey, Esq., Rachel S. (Attorney) on behalf of Dubin, M.D., Joseph, Gutierrez,M.D., Jose, Lahey Clinic Hospital,Inc. (Defendant) | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for medical malpractice tribunal filed by party for: Other Applies To: Blank, M.D., Jody S (Defendant); Gutierrez,M.D., Jose (Defendant); Dubin, M.D., Joseph (Defendant); Lahey Clinic Inc. (Defendant); Lahey Clinic Foundation,Inc. (Defendant) | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for medical malpractice tribunal filed by party for: Othernot listed Applies To: McCloskey, Esq., Rachel S. (Attorney) on behalf of Dubin, M.D., Joseph (Defendant) | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for medical malpractice tribunal filed by party for: Internal Medicine Applies To: Pro Se (Attorney) on behalf of Brian F. Dealy Personal Representative for the Estate of Cynthia A. Dealy (Plaintiff); Gould, Esq., David Miles (Attorney) on behalf of Dubin, M.D., Joseph, Gutierrez,M.D., Jose, Lahey Clinic Foundation,Inc., Lahey Clinic Hospital,Inc., Lahey Clinic Inc. (Defendant); McCloskey, Esq., Rachel S. (Attorney) on behalf of Dubin, M.D., Joseph, Gutierrez,M.D., Jose, Lahey Clinic Hospital,Inc. (Defendant) | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date David Miles Gould, Esq. added for Defendant Lahey Clinic Foundation,Inc. | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Lahey Clinic Foundation,Inc.: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date David Miles Gould, Esq. added for Defendant Lahey Clinic Inc. | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Lahey Clinic Inc.: Answer with claim for trial by jury; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.