Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Trustees Of Century Estates Condominium Trust v Farias et al
On April 30, 2014 condominium lien & charges case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA. Judge Dennis J. Curran presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 30, 2014
Last Refreshed
November 26, 2023
Filing Location
Middlesex County, MA
Category
Real Property
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Liens
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT: After hearing on Assessment of Damages, (i) this Court enters judgment in the amount of $22,557.98 with interest thereon from 4/30/14 to 7/1/14 in the amount of $459.82 constitutes a lien on the unit pursuant to M.G.L. c. 183A, section 6(c) and has a priorty as set forth therein; and (ii) pursuant to M.G.L. c. 254 sections 5 and 5(a) enter an Order of Sale to satisfy said lien. (Dennis J. Curran, Justice). Copies mailed 7/1/2014 | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#6) ALLOWED (Dennis J. Curran, Justice) Notices mailed 7/1/2014 | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Adilson F. Farias is not in military service | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Trustees Of Century Estates Condominium Trust's MOTION for judgment And Hearing On Assessment Of Damages And Issuance Of Notice To Sell (pursuan to M.G.L. C. 254, Sections and 5A); Memorandum of Assessment Of Damages; Affidavit Of Property Manager; Affidavit of Counsel | |
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant(s) Adilson F. Farias, The Bank Of New York Mellon. Copies mailed 6/11/2014 | |
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Adilson F. Farias, The Bank Of New York Mellon by Trustees Of Century Estates Condominium Trust | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance by Erik Shaughnessy with proof of service of complaint re: The Bank Of New York Mellon 5-27-2014, By Certified Mail, Return receipt attached 101 Barclay Street 4W, New York. N.Y. 10007 | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Adilson F. Farias(Defendant)5-6-2014, L&U 11 Weld Street Unit 10 Framingham, MA | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Judge Curran's Notice of Litigation Control Conference on 9/9/2014, copies mailed 5/13/2014. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL DIRECTED TO SERVE NOTICE OF CONFERENCE ON DEFENDANTS. | |
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type C05, Track X. | |
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed |