Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Beth Johnson Personal Representative for the Estate of Karla A. Johnson vs. Graves, Ashley D.
On June 07, 2024 a wrongful death - non-medical, g.l.c.229, §2a case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 07, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 08, 2024
Filing Location
Essex County, MA
Category
Torts
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I Wrongful Death — Punitive Damages v. Ashley D. Graves
COUNT II Survival Claims — Pain and Suffering v. Ashley D. Graves
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a civil action filed by Beth Johnson, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Karl A. Johnson, against Ashley D. Graves. The incident occurred on October 27, 2023, when Karl A. Johnson and his wife were crossing Pleasant…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 06/07/2024
Date: Jun 07, 2024Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: Jun 07, 2024Complaint electronically filed.
Date: Jun 07, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
June 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 06/07/2024 | |
June 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
June 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. |