Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bucknam, David vs. Njoroge, Sharon
On October 03, 2016 a motor vehicle negligence - personal injury / property damage case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA. Judge James F. Lang presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 03, 2016
Last Refreshed
July 13, 2023
Filing Location
Essex County, MA
Category
Torts
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Case sent to Essex Superior - SALEM Location. | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT of dismissal, David Bucknam failed to comply with an ORDER after review of the Docket dated 05/07/2018. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: that the complaint of the plaintiff, David Bucknam, be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice as to the defendant, Sharon Njoroge, for failure to comply with Status Review notice dated 5/7/18. Dated 6/15/18 Judge: Lang, Hon. James F
Judge: Lang, James |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 06/15/2018 07:00 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled Jo Dee Doyle, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Jo Dee Doyle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 06/08/2018 the complaint will be dismissed. Dated 5/7/18 Judge: Lang, Hon. James F
Judge: Lang, James |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for 12/06/16 Defendant Njoroge, Sharon: Service made at last and usual place of abode of Sharon Njoroge 61 Lynn Street Peabody, MA 01960 and by mailing 1st class to the above address. | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 10/03/2016 | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date James M. Merrigan, Esq. added for Plaintiff David Bucknam | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Christopher Davidson Fletcher, Esq. added for Plaintiff David Bucknam |