Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of: Flemon, Eugene
On August 02, 2023 prisoner habeas corpus case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 02, 2023
Last Refreshed
October 04, 2023
Filing Location
Bristol County, MA
Category
Miscellaneous Civil Actions
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Habeas Corpus
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: Aug 02, 2023Original civil complaint filed.
Date: Aug 02, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: that the matter is dismissed as the papers fail to make out a comprehensible claim. To the extent that the matter purports to be a writ of habeas corpus, it fails to comply with the provisions of G.L. c. 248. Judge: Dupuis, Hon. Renee P | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (#1.0): DENIED The matter is dismissed as the papers fail to make out a comprehensible claim. To the extent that the matter purports to be a writ of habeas corpus, it fails to comply with the provisions of G.L. c. 248. Judge: Dupuis, Hon. Renee P | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Determination regarding normal fees and costs ALLOWED FORTHWITH by Clerk waived in full , pursuant to G. L. c. 261, § 27C(2). Filing fee, summons and service of process Judge: Swanson, Dina | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Eugene Flemon, W106001's Motion to Answer Summons Presence of Court, in person. | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 08/02/2023 | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Pro Se added as Self Represented for Petitioner Eugene Flemon |