Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HADAD vs FORD MOTOR COMPANY
On June 21, 2024 a civil unlimited (contract/warranty breach - se...) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Joscelyn C. Jones presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 21, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 26, 2024
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of Alameda County
Category
Civil Unlimited (Contract/Warranty Breach - Se...)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE
SONG-BEVERLY CONSUMER WARRANTY
ACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal action filed by Plaintiff, IDAN HADAD, against Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY for violation of the Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act. Plaintiff alleges that they purchased a 2023 Ford F-150 vehicle from Fremont Sales and …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference RCD / Department 19 |
|
November 26, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
June 24, 2024 | Case assigned to Hon. Joscelyn Jones in Department 19 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse | ||
June 24, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/26/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 19 | ||
June 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Joscelyn Jones in Department 19 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse Assignment |
|
June 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/26/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 19 Event |
|
June 21, 2024 | Notice of Case Assignment | ||
June 21, 2024 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
June 21, 2024 | Summons on Complaint | ||
June 21, 2024 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
June 21, 2024 | Complaint | ||
June 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: IDAN HADAD (Plaintiff) As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant) Document |
|
June 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by: IDAN HADAD (Plaintiff) As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant) Document |
|
June 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: IDAN HADAD (Plaintiff) As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant) Document |