Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KEMPER INDEPENDENCE INSURANCE COMPANY vs DANIEL AUTOWORKS
On May 02, 2024 a civil unlimited (motor vehicle - personal inju...) case was filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company, represented by Koren Ellen Thal Jozana, against Daniel Autoworks, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Karin S. Schwartz presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 02, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 05, 2024
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of Alameda County
Category
Civil Unlimited (Motor Vehicle - Personal Inju...)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference RCD / Department 20 |
|
September 16, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
May 03, 2024 | Case assigned to Hon. Karin Schwartz in Department 20 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse | ||
May 03, 2024 | Miscellaneous - Other CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM | ||
May 03, 2024 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
May 03, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/16/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20 | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Karin Schwartz in Department 20 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse Assignment |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/16/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20 Event |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: KEMPER INDEPENDENCE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff) Document |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous - Other CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM Filed by: KEMPER INDEPENDENCE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff) Document |
|
May 02, 2024 | Notice of Case Assignment | ||
May 02, 2024 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
May 02, 2024 | Summons on Complaint | ||
May 02, 2024 | Complaint | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: KEMPER INDEPENDENCE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff) As to: DANIEL AUTOWORKS (Defendant) Document |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by: KEMPER INDEPENDENCE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff) As to: DANIEL AUTOWORKS (Defendant) Document |