Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
YOUNG vs SLAUGHTER
On May 01, 2024 a civil unlimited (other breach of contract/warr...) case was filed by Monrye Young, against Shondrell Nicholas Slaughter, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Joscelyn C. Jones presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 01, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 02, 2024
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of Alameda County
Category
Civil Unlimited (Other Breach of Contract/Warr...)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference RCD / Department 19 |
|
October 08, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
May 01, 2024 | Updated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): | ||
May 01, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/08/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 19 | ||
May 01, 2024 | Case assigned to Hon. Joscelyn Jones in Department 19 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse | ||
May 01, 2024 | Notice of Case Assignment | ||
May 01, 2024 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
May 01, 2024 | Summons on Complaint | ||
May 01, 2024 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
May 01, 2024 | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) | ||
May 01, 2024 | Request to Waive Court Fees | ||
May 01, 2024 | Complaint | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Joscelyn Jones in Department 19 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse Assignment |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Status Date changed from 05/01/2024 to 05/01/2024 Document |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/08/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 19 Event |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by: Clerk As to: Monrye Young (Plaintiff) Document |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by: Monrye Young (Plaintiff) Document |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by: Monrye Young (Plaintiff) As to: Shondrell Nicholas Slaughter (Defendant) Document |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Monrye Young (Plaintiff) Document |