Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Chris Epperson vs. Commisioner of Police, State of California - COMPLEX
A 27 Unlimited - Rico case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 18, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 19, 2024
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of California, County of Fresno
Judge
Hon. Tharpe, D
Category
27 Unlimited - RICO
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a personal injury case filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Fresno. The plaintiff, named Chris, is seeking damages for personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The complaint includes allegations of g…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Civil Complaint filed
Date: Jun 18, 2024Summons issued and filed
Date: Jun 18, 2024Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed
Date: Jun 18, 2024Notice of Hearing
Date: Jun 18, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
06/18/2024 - Civil Complaint filed Civil Complaint filed |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
06/18/2024 - Summons issued and filed Summons issued and filed |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
06/18/2024 - Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed by Deputy Clerk |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Notice of Hearing Notice of Case Management Conference and assignment of Judge for all purposes. |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
06/18/2024 - Civil case cover sheet Civil case cover sheet |