Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: 526 E Shields Avenue, Fresno, CA 93704
A 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case was filed by Quality Loan Service Corp., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Hamilton, Jr., Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 20, 2024
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2024
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Judge
Hon. Hamilton, Jr., Jeffrey Y.
Category
43 Unlimited - Other Petition (not specified)
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Notice Filed
Date: Feb 23, 2024Order Received for Signature
Date: Feb 20, 2024Civil case cover sheet
Date: Feb 20, 2024Petition filed
Date: Feb 20, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
CV-47 Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes Notice Filed Assignment of Judge for all Purposes |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
2/20/24 - Proposed Order to Deposit Order Received for Signature [Proposed] Order to Deposit Surplus Funds and Discharge Petitioner |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
2/20/24 - Civil Case Cover Sheet Civil case cover sheet |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
2/20/24 - Petition Re Unresolved Claims Petition filed and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale |